RI S0479 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the state building code standards committee by two members, to be appointed by the Rhode Island builders association.
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |