RI S0509 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates process to classify as Schedule I controlled substances certain synthetic substances/compounds.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0509.pdf |