RI S0541 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-18 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-18 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Relating To Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority -- Debt Management
Title
Joint Resolution Relating To Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority -- Debt Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2015) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2015) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |