RI S0615 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Services -- Long-term Care Service Reform For Medicaid Eligible Individuals
Title
An Act Relating To Human Services -- Long-term Care Service Reform For Medicaid Eligible Individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2013) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |