RI S0617 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires state contracted human services providers to pay his or her employees a minimum hourly wage no less than one hundred forty-four percent (144%) of the state minimum wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Of Health And Human Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019)
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback