RI S0617 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the restrictive housing oversight committee ("committee") for the purpose of monitoring the use of restrictive housing (solitary confinement), as well as disciplinary and administrative confinement at the department of corrections.
Title
Solitary Confinement Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0617.pdf |