RI S0656 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows information contained in the prescription drug monitoring database to be disclosed to a certified law enforcement drug diversion investigator of a qualified law enforcement agency.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Uniform controlled substances act approval of amendment (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Uniform controlled substances act approval of amendment (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |