RI S0666 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the tax administrator to remit thirteen percent (13%) of all hospital licensing fees to the municipality wherein the hospital is located.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0666.pdf |