RI S0671 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the North Kingstown municipal court to issue arrest warrants.
Title
Town Of North Kingstown--municipal Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0671.pdf |