RI S0753 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a system for the recycling of beverage containers working with the department of environmental management.
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Recycling Act Of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2023) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0753.pdf |