RI S0754 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Meeting postponed (06/05/2019)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the Cumberland Town Council to establish limits on the number of students from the Cumberland school district who may enroll in any charter public school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateMeeting postponed (06/05/2019)
2019-06-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback