RI S0767 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the town council of the town of Jamestown the authority to provide for certain exemptions or tax credits for any veteran of the United States armed services.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation - Veterans' Exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee heard and continued |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |