RI S0816 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Frajeelai, Llc
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Frajeelai, Llc
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2021) |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/13/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar |