RI S0832 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vests jurisdiction over the adjudication of violations relating to obstructing and interfering with the lawful taking of wildlife with the Rhode Island traffic tribunal, and would set forth the relevant penalties related thereto.
Title
Traffic Tribunal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0832.pdf |