RI S0836 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers - Municipal Streetlight Investment Act (would Establish A Procedure To Allow Municipalities To Purchase, Rather Than Rent, Their Street Lights For The Purpose Of Reducing Municipal Street Lighting Costs.)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers - Municipal Streetlight Investment Act (would Establish A Procedure To Allow Municipalities To Purchase, Rather Than Rent, Their Street Lights For The Purpose Of Reducing Municipal Street Lighting Costs.)
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-22 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2013) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |