RI S0841 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Advisory Council On Organ And Tissue Donations And Transplants: would establish the Rhode Island advisory council on organ and tissue donations and transplants and would also create the organ and tissue donor registration fund
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Advisory Council On Organ And Tissue Donations And Transplants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services | |
2011-05-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-05-18 | Committee continued | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-05-04 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-12 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0841.pdf |