RI S0879 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Town Of West Warwick -- Home Rule Charter
Title
An Act Relating To The Town Of West Warwick -- Home Rule Charter
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Francis Maher [R] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Michael Pinga [D] |
Sen. Glenford Shibley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-05-11 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-05-10 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0879.pdf |