RI S0886 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - License For Motorcycles (would Provide Landowners Who Allow Private Property To Be Used For A Motorcycle Safety Education Program With Civil Immunity.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - License For Motorcycles (would Provide Landowners Who Allow Private Property To Be Used For A Motorcycle Safety Education Program With Civil Immunity.)
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2013) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0886.pdf |