RI S0899 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that the purchasing board meeting agenda in the town of North Providence be sent to board members at least five (5) days before the meeting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending The Charter Of North Providence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-19HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-17HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2019)
2019-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019)
2019-06-10HouseMeeting postponed (06/11/2019)
2019-06-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2019-06-07HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2019-06-06SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019)
2019-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019)
2019-05-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback