RI S1027 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the law prohibiting texting while operating a motor vehicle to clarify that drivers are permitted to make phone calls or use GPS navigation tools and applications.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |