RI S2028 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- OUTDOOR DINING ACT - Establishes standards governing the municipal regulation of outdoor dining at food service establishments.
Title
Establishes standards governing the municipal regulation of outdoor dining at food service establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs: Passage of Sub A (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs: Passage of Sub A (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-02-08 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/08/2024) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/08/2024) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (01/31/2024) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/16/2024) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |