RI S2045 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC FINANCE -- RHODE ISLAND RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM ACT - Establishes Rhode Island Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program to be administered by the general treasurer.
Title
Establishes Rhode Island Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program to be administered by the general treasurer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2045.pdf |