RI S2148 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- THE KINDERGARTEN THROUGH GRADE TWO - 2) MAXIMUM CLASS SIZE ACT (Mandates 20 students per classroom for kindergarten through second grade. Exceptions for emergencies and temporary situations, not to exceed 3 days and mid-year enrollments.
Title
2) MAXIMUM CLASS SIZE ACT (Mandates 20 students per classroom for kindergarten through second grade. Exceptions for emergencies and temporary situations, not to exceed 3 days and mid-year enrollments.
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2148.pdf |