RI S2174 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- LICENSING OF YOUTH CAMPS - Establishes the procedures and requirements for the licensing of youth camps.
Title
Establishes the procedures and requirements for the licensing of youth camps.
Sponsors
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |