RI S2190 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- HISTORICAL AREA ZONING - Authorizes the town of South Kingstown to adopt a local ordinance to delay the demolition of historic properties located in the town.
Title
Authorizes the town of South Kingstown to adopt a local ordinance to delay the demolition of historic properties located in the town.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2190.pdf |