RI S2227 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- EXPUNGEMENT OF CRIMINAL RECORDS - Redefines misdemeanors for expungement purposes and make prior felonies, subsequently reclassified as misdemeanors, eligible for expungement pursuant to sections 12-1.3-2 and 12-1.3-3.
Title
Redefines misdemeanors for expungement purposes and make prior felonies, subsequently reclassified as misdemeanors, eligible for expungement pursuant to sections 12-1.3-2 and 12-1.3-3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2227.pdf |