RI S2255 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES -- INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR PREVENTION OF HIV INFECTION - Eliminates prior authorization or step therapy requirement for prescriptions for any HIV prevention drug/prohibits the requirement of any copayment or the meeting of any deductible to obtain the prescription covered by the contract, plan, or policy.
Title
Eliminates prior authorization or step therapy requirement for prescriptions for any HIV prevention drug/prohibits the requirement of any copayment or the meeting of any deductible to obtain the prescription covered by the contract, plan, or policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/14/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES -- INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR PREVENTION OF HIV INFECTION
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES -- INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR PREVENTION OF HIV INFECTION