RI S2269 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 Senate Commerce Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 Senate Commerce Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- CASUALTY INSURANCE RATING - Prevents insurance companies from treating widowed persons differently than married persons when establishing or maintaining an insured's rate or classification respecting the operation of a personal motor vehicle. Effective 1/1/25.
Title
Prevents insurance companies from treating widowed persons differently than married persons when establishing or maintaining an insured's rate or classification respecting the operation of a personal motor vehicle. Effective 1/1/25.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |