RI S2336 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that Interscholastic League Athletes and youth sports athletes who are female and 19 years of age or younger and who play certain softball positions wear protective face masks during practice and at games.
Title
School And Youth Programs Concussion Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2016) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2336.pdf |