RI S2350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides healthcare facilities specializing in domestic medical tourism with expeditious review and an exemption from the certificate of need process.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2350.pdf |