RI S2498 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Proclaiming April 25, 2024, To Be "parental Alienation Awareness Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
SENATE RESOLUTION PROCLAIMING APRIL 25, 2024, TO BE "PARENTAL ALIENATION AWARENESS DAY" IN THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2498.pdf |