RI S2535 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2024)
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Hearing: May 1 Senate Environment and Agriculture Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2024)
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Hearing: May 1 Senate Environment and Agriculture Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ACT - Establishes requirements which would have to be met by an applicant prior to the issuing of permits for an activity that would have an environmental impact on or would increase the cumulative impacts on an environmental justice area.
Title
Establishes requirements which would have to be met by an applicant prior to the issuing of permits for an activity that would have an environmental impact on or would increase the cumulative impacts on an environmental justice area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2024) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2535.pdf |