RI S2544 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- HAZARDOUS WASTE MANAGEMENT - Does not require the remediation of occurring arsenic in the soil with direct exposure of less than or equal to twenty (20) milligrams per kilogram.
Title
Does not require the remediation of occurring arsenic in the soil with direct exposure of less than or equal to twenty (20) milligrams per kilogram.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2544.pdf |