RI S2607 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES - Requires coverage for acute mental health crisis mobile response and stabilization services to any individual enrolled as a plan beneficiary.
Title
Requires coverage for acute mental health crisis mobile response and stabilization services to any individual enrolled as a plan beneficiary.
Sponsors
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2607.pdf |