RI S2643 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT - Requires landlords to list all mandatory fees when advertising any residential property for rent as well as on the first page of any lease. Prohibits a landlord from charging a convenience fee when the tenant pays rent.
Title
Requires landlords to list all mandatory fees when advertising any residential property for rent as well as on the first page of any lease. Prohibits a landlord from charging a convenience fee when the tenant pays rent.
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2643.pdf |