RI S2732 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- HUNTING AND HUNTING SAFETY -- CAPTIVE HUNTING PROHIBITED - Prohibits captive hunting for domestic or wild animals and does not prohibit the release of domestic game birds for hunting on licensed shooting preserves.
Title
Prohibits captive hunting for domestic or wild animals and does not prohibit the release of domestic game birds for hunting on licensed shooting preserves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Fish And Wildlife
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- HUNTING AND HUNTING SAFETY
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- HUNTING AND HUNTING SAFETY -- CAPTIVE HUNTING PROHIBITED
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- HUNTING AND HUNTING SAFETY
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- HUNTING AND HUNTING SAFETY -- CAPTIVE HUNTING PROHIBITED