RI S2742 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends definition of "state agency" for purposes of the chapter on "state purchases" to provide for an exemption for the URI board of trustees when making purchases funded by restricted, sponsored, or auxiliary monies, from the provisions of the chapter.
Title
State Purchases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2020) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |