RI S2753 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- COMPOSTING AND ORGANIC WASTE DIVERSION - Establishes Compost Fund to award grants related to reducing the amount of solid waste generated in the state.
Title
Establishes Compost Fund to award grants related to reducing the amount of solid waste generated in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2753.pdf |