RI S2874 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- CERTIFIED SURGICAL FIRST ASSISTANTS - Allows for the licensing of certified surgical first assistants to assist in surgeries through the department of health and a seven (7) member board of licensure.
Title
Allows for the licensing of certified surgical first assistants to assist in surgeries through the department of health and a seven (7) member board of licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2874.pdf |