RI S2878 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- GENERAL POWERS - Authorizes the town of Cumberland to require the registration of certain business entities not registered with the secretary of state that are situated in Cumberland.
Title
Authorizes the town of Cumberland to require the registration of certain business entities not registered with the secretary of state that are situated in Cumberland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-03 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |