RI S2889 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- TAX SALES - Defines who is eligible to bid at tax sales; Authorizes Rhode Island housing and mortgage finance corporation to use excess funds collected under § 34-27-3.2 to purchase at tax sale owner-occupied residences.
Title
Defines who is eligible to bid at tax sales; Authorizes Rhode Island housing and mortgage finance corporation to use excess funds collected under § 34-27-3.2 to purchase at tax sale owner-occupied residences.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2889.pdf |