RI S3068 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION -- BENEFITS - Amends 4 sections relating to the workers' compensation benefits dealing with increasing the amount of dependent benefits payable to a totally disabled employee comprising this year's annual omnibus bill.
Title
Amends 4 sections relating to the workers' compensation benefits dealing with increasing the amount of dependent benefits payable to a totally disabled employee comprising this year's annual omnibus bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2024) |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Labor And Labor Relations
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION -- BENEFITS
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- WORKERS' COMPENSATION -- BENEFITS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S3068.pdf |