SC H3017 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Make Application By The State Of South Carolina Under Article V Of The United States Constitution For A Convention Of The States To Be Called Restricted To Propose An Amendment To The United States Constitution To Impose Fiscal Restraints On The Federal Government Through A Balanced Budget Amendment.
Title
Convention of the States
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon |
2019-05-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2019-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett |
2019-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry |
2019-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox |
2019-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace |
2019-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3017&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3017_20181218.htm |