SC H3101 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 40 To Chapter 5, Title 56 So As To Define The Term "salvage Pool Operator" And Provide For The Disposition Of A Motor Vehicle In The Possession Of A Salvage Pool Operator Who, Upon The Request Of An Insurance Company, Takes Possession Of A Motor Vehicle That Is The Subject Of An Insurance Claim And Subsequently The Insurance Company Denies Motor Vehicle Insurance Coverage Or Does Not Take Ownership Of The Motor Vehicle; To Amend Section 56-1-10, As Amended, Relating To Certain Terms And Their Definitions Contained In The Provisions That Pertain To The Department Of Motor Vehicles, So As To Create Additional Terms And Definitions Relating To Salvage, Junk, And Off-road-use Vehicles; To Amend Section 56-19-480, As Amended, Relating To The Transfer And Surrender Of Certificates Of Title, License Plates, Registration Cards, And Manufacturers' Special Plates For Vehicles Sold As Salvage, Abandoned, Scrapped, Or Destroyed, So As To Delete An Obsolete Term, Make Technical Changes, To Provide This Section Applies Also To Salvage Flood And Salvage Fire Vehicles, And To Delete The Provision That Requires Certain Vehicles To Undergo An Inspection; And To Amend Section 56-19-485, Relating To The Title-brand Designation Of Vehicles As "wreckage" Or "salvage", So As To Delete These Designations And To Provide The Title-brand Designation Must Be One That Is Contained In Section 56-1-10. - Ratified Title
Title
Motor vehicle, salvage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Act No. 27 | |
2021-04-30 | Effective date 10/25/2021 | |
2021-04-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-28 | Ratified R 40 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-115 Nays-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 19 | 480 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 19 | 485 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |