SC H3172 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Jones
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Jones
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 7-5-320, Relating To The Application For Motor Vehicle Driver's License And Voter Registration, So As To Provide That Each State Identification Card Application Or Motor Vehicle Driver's License Application, Including Renewal Applications, Submitted To The Department Of Motor Vehicles Shall Serve As An Application For Voter Registration, To Eliminate The Requirement That The Applicant Sign A Separate Voter Registration Portion Of The Application In Order To Register, To Provide That The Applicant Shall Consent To The Use Of His Signature From His State Identification Card Or Driver's License Issued By The Department Of Motor Vehicles For Voter Registration Purposes, And To Provide A Procedure For An Individual To Decline Registration.
Title
Voter Registration, DMV transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Jones |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0006 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0886 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
S0886 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3172&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3172_20221208.htm |