SC H3180 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Act No. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Act No. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The State Budget And Control Board To Transfer Ownership Of Clover National Guard Armory In Clover, South Carolina, To The Town Of Clover
Title
Clover National Guard Armory
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Adopt Joint Resolution (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Adopt Joint Resolution (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | Act No. 117 | |
2013-03-11 | Effective date 03/01/13 | |
2013-03-01 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-02-27 | Ratified R 6 | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-01-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-0 |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss |
2013-01-17 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2012-12-18 | House | Prefiled |