SC H3298 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 16-23-20, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE CARRYING OF A HANDGUN, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT A PERSON MAY LAWFULLY STOW A HANDGUN UNDER THE SEAT OF A VEHICLE.
Title
Provide That A Person May Lawfully Stow A Handgun Under The Seat Of A Vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman | |
2010-05-19 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-20 | |
2010-05-19 | Introduced and read first time SJ-20 | |
2010-05-19 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-7 | |
2010-05-18 | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 HJ-32 | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time HJ-30 | |
2010-05-18 | Amended HJ-30 | |
2010-05-13 | Debate interrupted HJ-30 | |
2010-05-13 | Amended HJ-27 | |
2010-05-06 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-5 | |
2010-02-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Millwood | |
2009-02-17 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Parker | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-422 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced and read first time HJ-422 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3298&session=118 |