SC H3519 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 56-2-140, So As To Define Certain Terms, And For The Registration And Operation Of Utility Terrain Vehicles On The Highways Of This State.
Title
Utility Terrain Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3359 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-31 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3519&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3519_20221215.htm |