SC H3586 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Include In These Exemptions Associated Amenity Structures On Fishing Piers; To Exempt Such A Structure From Permit Requirements If The Local Governing Body For Planning And Zoning Authorized The Construction Of The Structure; To Specify Certain Structures That Are Not Associated Amenity Structures; And To Provide A Maximum Amount Of The Pier That Such A Structure May Cover
Title
Piers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Act No. 25 | |
2011-05-13 | Effective date 05/09/11 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Ratified R 45 | |
2011-04-27 | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-27 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled | |
2011-04-20 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-2 | |
2011-04-19 | Read second time | |
2011-04-19 | Amended | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-04-14 | Polled out of committee Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-03-03 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-03-03 | Read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced and read first time |