SC H3592 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 40-43-30, Relating To Definitions In The Pharmacy Practice Act, So As To Remove Certain Definitions; By Amending Section 40-43-86, Relating To Compounding Of Medications By Pharmacies , So As To Revise Requirements For Compounding Pharmacies; By Amending Section 40-43-87, Relating To Nuclear/radiologic Pharmacy Practices, So As To Remove Requirements Concerning Nuclear Pharmacy Facilities; And By Amending Section 40-43-88, Relating To Standards For Preparation, Labeling, And Distribution Of Sterile Products By Pharmacies, So As To Remove Certain Standards.
Title
Compounding pharmacies
Sponsors
Rep. Max Hyde [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2024-03-20 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-01-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-05-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2023-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-04 | House | Amended |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 43 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 87 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 43 | 88 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |